CO HB1326 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Student Not Affected By Dist Accreditation Status
Title
Student Not Affected By Dist Accreditation Status
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 15-1326 indefinitely (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1326, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1326, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2015-04-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-17 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-04-15 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |