CO HB1331 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning removing the limit on the departments with which the evidence-based practices implementation for capacity resource center can collaborate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Remove Limitation On Evidence-based Practices Implementation For Capacity Resource Center Collaboration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1331 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1331 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23 Governor Signed
2019-05-15SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-15 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-03SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-05-02SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-30SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-29SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations
2019-04-27HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-26HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-25HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-24HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1331
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1331_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1331_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1331_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1331_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1331_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1331_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/af39361194fca4d2872583e700793a7a-hb19-1331-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1331vote6b39ac
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/355b2cd25fba09b4872583ec006f490b-hb19-1331-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1331vote55c6a9

Bill Comments

feedback