CO HB1336 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning additional protections for oil and gas interest owners subject to pooling of oil and gas resources.
Title
Additional Protections Forced Pooling Order
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Foote [D] | Rep. David Young [D] | Sen. Irene Aguilar [D] | Sen. Matt Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1336 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1336 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1336 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Adopt a conceptual amendment to amendment L.005 changing the spelling of "driling" on lines 4 and lines 8 to "drilling", and changing "with" to "within" on line 4. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-19 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1336, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1336, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1336 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1336 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Adopt a conceptual amendment to amendment L.005 changing the spelling of "driling" on lines 4 and lines 8 to "drilling", and changing "with" to "within" on line 4. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-19 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1336, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1336, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-04-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-04-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-19 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-04-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |