CO HB1360 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning mechanisms to support the integration of Coloradans with disabilities into their communities, and, in connection therewith, creating the Colorado disability opportunity office in the department of labor and employment, moving the Colorado disability funding committee and its functions from the department of personnel to the Colorado disability opportunity office, and making and reducing an appropriation.
Title
Colorado Disability Opportunity Office
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1360, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1360, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1360 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1360, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1360, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1360, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1360 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1360, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1360, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-08 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Finance |
2024-03-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |