CO HB1361 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the reduction of the adult dental benefit, and, in connection therewith, reducing an appropriation.
Title
Reduce The Adult Dental Benefit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1361 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 36 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1361 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1361 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 36 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1361 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2020-06-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-02 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-06-02 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-05-27 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-05-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |