CO HB1373 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of the state telecommunications network by private entities through public-private partnerships, and, in connection therewith, relocating laws related to the state telecommunications network from the department of public safety's statutes to the statutes regarding telecommunications coordination within state government.
Title
Private Entities Use State Telecommunications Network
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1373 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1373 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1373 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1373 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2018-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-24 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-19 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |