CO HB1384 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 1:30 pm in Room SCR 357
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 1:30 pm in Room SCR 357
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning applying for federal grants related to certified community behavioral health clinics.
Title
Certified Community Behavioral Health Clinics
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1384, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1384, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1384, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1384, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2024-04-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-23 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-16 | House | House Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services |