CO HB1394 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning amendments to the Colorado disaster emergency act to address all phases of emergency management.
Title
Update Colorado Disaster Emergency Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1394 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.006 [Attachment B]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1394, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1394 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Local Government: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - House Local Government: Refer House Bill 18-1394, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1394 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.006 [Attachment B]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1394, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1394 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Local Government: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - House Local Government: Refer House Bill 18-1394, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-07 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-05-04 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2018-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-19 | House | House Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-04-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |