CO HB1417 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Capital-related Transfers Of Moneys
Title
Capital-related Transfers Of Moneys
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1417 to the Committee of the Whole and consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1417 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1417 to the Committee of the Whole and consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1417 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-04-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-04-25 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-04-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-07 | House | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2016-04-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-31 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-29 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-03-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |