CO HB1417 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the establishment of administrative conditions related to money in the general fund from the federal coronavirus relief fund that apply to an allocation established in separate legislation until the unspent money remaining in the subfund is transferred to the unemployment compensation fund on December 30, 2020.
Title
Care Subfund In The General Fund
Sponsors
Rep. KC Becker [D] | Sen. Chris Hansen [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1417 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1417 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1417 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1417 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1417 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1417 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2020-06-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2020-06-08 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-06 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-06-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |