CO HB1419 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a transfer of ten million dollars from the energy and carbon management cash fund to the stationary sources control fund.
Title
Transfer to Stationary Sources Control Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Shannon Bird [D] | Rep. Rick Taggart [R] | Sen. Jeff Bridges [D] | Sen. Rachel Zenzinger [D] |
Rep. Emily Sirota [D] | Rep. Julie McCluskie [D] | Rep. Alex Valdez [D] | Rep. Steven Woodrow [D] |
Sen. Kevin Priola [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1419 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1419 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1419 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1419 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Governor Signed | |
2024-04-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-04-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2024-04-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-27 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |