CO HB1432 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning eliminating the requirement for a defendant to pay the Colorado bureau of investigation for costs related to sealing criminal justice records in the bureau's custody, and, in connection therewith, making and reducing an appropriation.
Title
Repeal CBI Criminal Justice Record Sealing Fee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1432 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1432, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1432 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1432, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1432 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-24 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-04-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-10 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-04-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |