CO HB1438 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the implementation of certain affordable prescription drug programs, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Implement Prescription Drug Affordability Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1438 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1438, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1438, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1438, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1438, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1438, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1438, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1438, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1438, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1438, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1438, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-04-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-22 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-20 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-19 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-16 | House | House Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-04-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services |