CO HB1442 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning modifications to the capitol building advisory committee.
Title
Capital Building Advisory Committee Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1442 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 24-1442 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1442 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 24-1442 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-15 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-04-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |