CO HB1456 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning testing for syphilis during the perinatal period.
Title
Increase Syphilis Testing During Pregnancy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1456, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D). (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-23 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1456, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1456, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D). (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-23 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1456, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2024-04-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-23 | House | House Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services |