CO HB1459 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning protections for birthing persons.
Title
Birth Equity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1459, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1459, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-04-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-27 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-23 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |