CO HB1462 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a third-party evaluation of the department of corrections' budget practices, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Third-Party Audit Department of Corrections
Sponsors
Rep. Shannon Bird [D] | Rep. Emily Sirota [D] | Sen. Jeff Bridges [D] | Sen. Rachel Zenzinger [D] |
Rep. Rick Taggart [R] | Sen. Barbara Kirkmeyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1462 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |