CO HJR1010 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-16 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-16 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Summary
Civility In The General Assembly
Title
Civility In The General Assembly
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-02-15 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-02-11 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-09 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-02-09 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to | |
2010-02-08 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-05 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-02-05 | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
Colorado State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/39B39DBA116ABC70872576B100638EF6?Open |