CO HM1004 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-07 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Status: Introduced on April 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-07 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Summary
Memorializing Ed Carpenter
Title
Memorializing Ed Carpenter
Sponsors
Sen. Steve King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-04-19 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-12 | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/19/2010 | |
2010-04-12 | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
Colorado State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E4D60558628CD440872576E80079F16F?Open |