CO HM1004 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-20 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Status: Introduced on April 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-20 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Summary
Memorializing Eunice Wharton Fine
Title
Memorializing Eunice Wharton Fine
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Vaad [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-20 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-04-18 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-13 | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/18/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
Colorado State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/131F0EA034CC119487257808008045FB?Open |