CO HM1004 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-22 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-22 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorialize Former Representative Bill Berens
Title
Memorialize Former Representative Bill Berens
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-04-14 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-08 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/14/2016 - No Amendments |
2016-04-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |