CO SB007 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the prevention of sexual misconduct on higher education campuses.
Title
Prevent Sexual Misconduct At Higher Ed Campuses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-007 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-007, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Education: This is a conceptual amendment. On page 4 of the introduced bill, strike lines 18 through 23. (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-007, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-007 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-007, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Education: This is a conceptual amendment. On page 4 of the introduced bill, strike lines 18 through 23. (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-007, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-30 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |