CO SB044 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Failure To Provide Valid Transit Pass Or Coupon
Title
Failure To Provide Valid Transit Pass Or Coupon
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-044 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-044 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt prepared amendment L.005 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-04-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-044, as amended, to the Committee on Finance with a favorable recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt prepared amendment L.007 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-04-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt prepared amendment L.005 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-04-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt prepared amendment L.007 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-04-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-044, as amended, to the Committee on Finance with a favorable recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW - amended - CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW - amended - CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Having voted on the prevailing side, move to reconsider Senate Bill 12-044, as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.003 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-044 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Having voted on the prevailing side, move to reconsider Senate Bill 12-044, as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.003 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-044 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-044 as amended to the Committee on Finance with a favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Amend the printed bill to add a safety clause (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Amend the printed bill to add a safety clause (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-044 as amended to the Committee on Finance with a favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-044, as amended, to the Committee on Finance with a favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-044 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-044 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt prepared amendment L.005 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-04-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-044, as amended, to the Committee on Finance with a favorable recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt prepared amendment L.007 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-04-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt prepared amendment L.005 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-04-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt prepared amendment L.007 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-04-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-044, as amended, to the Committee on Finance with a favorable recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW - amended - CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW - amended - CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Having voted on the prevailing side, move to reconsider Senate Bill 12-044, as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.003 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-044 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Having voted on the prevailing side, move to reconsider Senate Bill 12-044, as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.003 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-044 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-044 as amended to the Committee on Finance with a favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Amend the printed bill to add a safety clause (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Amend the printed bill to add a safety clause (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-044 as amended to the Committee on Finance with a favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-044, as amended, to the Committee on Finance with a favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-08 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2012-05-08 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-07 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-05-03 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-05-01 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-04-25 | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2012-04-18 | House Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to Finance | |
2012-03-29 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-20 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-03-16 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |