CO SB046 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning authorization to increase the minimum donation required to be issued a certificate that qualifies a person to be issued a group special license plate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special License Plate Nonprofit Donation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 37 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-046 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-046 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22 Governor Signed
2018-03-12 Sent to the Governor
2018-03-12HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-03-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-03-06HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-03-05HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-02-28HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-02-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
2018-02-05SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-02-02SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-01-30SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-01-10SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb18-046
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_046_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_046_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_046_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_046_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_046_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_046_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2018a2018-01-30t140319z-sb18-046-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-046vote6046c5
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/htra2018a2018-02-28t133049z-sb18-046-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-046vote5c4445

Bill Comments

feedback