CO SB049 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Real Estate Title Vests In Entity Once Formed
Title
Real Estate Title Vests In Entity Once Formed
Sponsors
Sen. Beth Humenik [R] | Rep. Jon Keyser [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-049 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-049 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-049 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-049 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-049 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-03 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-03-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-06 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-03 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |