CO SB063 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - House Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - House Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Health Care In Local Gov Master Plans
Title
Health Care In Local Gov Master Plans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-063 to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-063 to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-063 to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-063 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-063 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-63 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-063 to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-063 to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-063 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-063 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-63 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-11 | House Third Reading Lost | |
2011-04-07 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-06 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-29 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-03-23 | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-02-25 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-21 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/25/2011 | |
2011-02-15 | Senate Committee on Local Government and Energy Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government and Energy |