CO SB078 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning alternatives to health insurer prior authorization requirements for health-care providers that achieve a specified approval rate on prior authorization requests.
Title
Prior Authorization Exemption Health-care Provider
Sponsors
Sen. Joann Ginal [D] | Sen. Barbara Kirkmeyer [R] | Rep. Shannon Bird [D] | Rep. Tim Geitner [R] |
Sen. Dominick Moreno [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-078 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 22-078, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 22-078, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-078 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 22-078, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment F) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 22-078, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 22-078, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 22-078, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-078 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 22-078, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment F) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 22-078, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-05-09 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-02 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-02-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 02/24/2022 - No Amendments |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |