CO SB078 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
Hearing: May 3 @ 8:00 am in Room Old State Library
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
Hearing: May 3 @ 8:00 am in Room Old State Library
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning including outdoor nature-based preschool programs as a type of child care center in the department of early childhood for licensing-related matters, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Outdoor Nature-Based Preschool Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-01 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 24-078 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-078, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 24-078 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-078, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 24-078 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-04-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |