CO SB079 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-11 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-11 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Rule Review Bill
Title
Rule Review Bill
Sponsors
Sen. John Morse [D] | Sen. Bob Gardner [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 5-0. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 5-0. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - To send Senate Bill 13-079 to the Senate Appropriations committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - To send Senate Bill 13-079 to the Senate Appropriations committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 5-0. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - To send Senate Bill 13-079 to the Senate Appropriations committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - To send Senate Bill 13-079 to the Senate Appropriations committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-11 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-04-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-10 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-05 | House | House Committee on Legal Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Legal Services |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Legal Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Legal Services |