CO SB086 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Unlimited Pension Or Annuity Tax Deduction
Title
Unlimited Pension Or Annuity Tax Deduction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-086 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 16-086 indefinitely (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-086 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-086 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.001 (Attachment K) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-086 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.001 (Attachment K) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-086 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 16-086 indefinitely (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-086 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-086 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.001 (Attachment K) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-086 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.001 (Attachment K) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-086 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2016-04-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |