CO SB086 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 8:00 am in Room Old State Library
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 8:00 am in Room Old State Library
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the breast and cervical cancer prevention and treatment fund.
Title
Breast Cancer Screening Fund Transfer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-086, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-086 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-086 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |