CO SB100 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning disclosure of additional mandatory charges by motor vehicle rental companies.
Title
Motor Vehicle Rental Charges Disclosures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-100 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-100 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - : Refer Senate Bill 18-100 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-100 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-100 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - : Refer Senate Bill 18-100 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Governor Signed | |
2018-03-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-03-12 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-05 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-28 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |