CO SB106 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-11)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning legal actions based on claimed defects in construction projects.
Title
Right to Remedy Construction Defects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.129) (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.005) (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.004) (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.003) (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.002) (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.001) (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer Senate Bill 24-106, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.043 (Attachment D). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.039 (Attachment H). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.038 (Attachment G). (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.033 (Attachment F). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.031 (Attachment E). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.020 (Attachment B). (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer Senate Bill 24-106, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.129) (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.005) (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.004) (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.003) (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.002) (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.001) (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer Senate Bill 24-106, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.043 (Attachment D). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.039 (Attachment H). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.038 (Attachment G). (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.033 (Attachment F). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.031 (Attachment E). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.020 (Attachment B). (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer Senate Bill 24-106, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/08/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/01/24 - No Amendments |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government & Housing Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government & Housing |