CO SB111 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of a program to support entrepreneurs in the marijuana industry.
Title
Program To Support Marijuana Entrepreneurs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.004) (Y: 17 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.003) (Y: 23 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-03-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-111 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-111 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.004) (Y: 17 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.003) (Y: 23 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-03-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-111 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-111 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-21 | Governor Signed | |
2021-03-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-03-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-04 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-02 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |