CO SB112 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a supplemental appropriation to the offices of the governor, lieutenant governor, and state planning and budgeting.
Title
Suppl Approp Dept Governor, Lt. Gov, OSPB
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-112 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-112 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-112 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-112 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Governor Signed | |
2019-02-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-02-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-02-15 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-14 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-12 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |