CO SB124 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 in Room Old State Library
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 in Room Old State Library
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning requiring health-care coverage for biomarker testing.
Title
Health-Care Coverage for Biomarker Testing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-124 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 24-124, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-124 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 24-124, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |