CO SB148 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-15 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-15 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Transfer Of Enterprise Facility To OIT
Title
Transfer Of Enterprise Facility To OIT
Sponsors
Sen. Kent Lambert [R] | Sen. Al White [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-15 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-04-06 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-05 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-04-05 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-18 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-17 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-12 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-25 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-23 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-02-19 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-04 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |