CO SB157 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the enforcement of laws relating to unfair business practices committed by regulated persons.
Title
Information Sharing For Consumer Protection Investigation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 22-157, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 22-157, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 22-157, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 22-157, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 22-157, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 22-157, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 22-157, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 22-157, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Governor Signed | |
2022-04-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-04-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-04-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-14 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-13 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-31 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |