CO SB160 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the community crime victims grant program, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations of the 2022 sunset report on the community crime victims grant program by the department of regulatory agencies.
Title
Sunset Continue Community Crime Victims Grant Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-160 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 23-160 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-160 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 23-160, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 23-160, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-160 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 23-160 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-160 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 23-160, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 23-160, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-17 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-04 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-21 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-21 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-12 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2023-04-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |