CO SB176 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Solitary Confinement Specific Population
Title
Solitary Confinement Specific Population
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-176 to the Committee on Appropriations with favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-176 to the Committee on Appropriations with favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-176 to the Committee on Appropriations with favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow and consent calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow and consent calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow and consent calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-176, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-176, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-176, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-176 to the Committee on Appropriations with favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-176 to the Committee on Appropriations with favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow and consent calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow and consent calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow and consent calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-176, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-176, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-176, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-18 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-05-16 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-11 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-10 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2011-05-06 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-05-06 | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2011-05-05 | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs + Appropriations | |
2011-05-02 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-29 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-29 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-04-26 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2011-02-21 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations |