CO SB176 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning measures to expand opportunities for students to earn postsecondary course credit while enrolled in high school, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Expanding Concurrent Enrollment Opportunities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.011 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-176, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-176, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-176, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-176, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-176, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-176, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.011 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-176, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-176, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-176, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-176, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-176, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-176, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-05-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-05-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-23 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-04-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |