CO SB189 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning gender-related changes to crimes that involve bias.
Title
Gender-Related Bias-Motivated Crimes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 24-189, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 24-189, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 24-189, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 24-189, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 24-189, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 24-189, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 24-189, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-16 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/08/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |