CO SB191 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - House Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - House Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Pipeline Rights-of-way
Title
Pipeline Rights-of-way
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-191, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. A substitute motion was offered. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment D) (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - SUBSTITUTE MOTION: Postpone Senate Bill 13-191 indefinitely (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment B) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-191, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. A substitute motion was offered. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment D) (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment B) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - SUBSTITUTE MOTION: Postpone Senate Bill 13-191 indefinitely (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment A) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment B) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment C) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-191, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment A) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment B) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment C) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-191, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment D) (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - SUBSTITUTE MOTION: Postpone Senate Bill 13-191 indefinitely (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment B) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-191, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. A substitute motion was offered. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment D) (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment B) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - SUBSTITUTE MOTION: Postpone Senate Bill 13-191 indefinitely (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment A) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment B) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment C) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-191, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment A) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment B) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment C) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-191, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely |
2013-04-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/10/2013 |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/05/2013 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |