CO SB196 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the modification of procurement requirements for state contracts for public projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Colorado Quality Apprenticeship Training Act Of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.028) (Y: 23 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-04-27 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.027) (Y: 22 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-04-27 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.031) (Y: 28 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-196 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment F). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.019 (Attachment H). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-196, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-196, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Joint - Capital Development Committee: Favorably recommend Senate Bill 19-196 with the strike-below amendment to the full Senate. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-196, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-196, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28 Governor Signed
2019-05-13 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-13HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-10SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-30SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-04-29HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-27HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-26HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-26HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-23HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-04-16HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2019-04-16SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-15SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-12SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-11SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-08SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-196
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_196_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_196_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_196_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_196_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_196_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_196_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/33165a3f3efbb40d872583d6006f8e5e-sb19-196-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f656358b46a3ed1f872583d7004e8006-sb19-196-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-196vote58e8e1
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d32a4ad65f1e2a33872583e5006ba75c-sb19-196-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/33165a3f3efbb40d872583d6006f8e5e-sb19-196-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/258f6003aa56640c872583e8004f36cf-sb19-196-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-196vote662691
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-196vote664c35
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-196vote6667d5
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-196vote5db61b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-196vote3dab27
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-196vote3dbd6c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d32a4ad65f1e2a33872583e5006ba75c-sb19-196-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d32a4ad65f1e2a33872583e5006ba75c-sb19-196-7-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d32a4ad65f1e2a33872583e5006ba75c-sb19-196-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d32a4ad65f1e2a33872583e5006ba75c-sb19-196-6-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d32a4ad65f1e2a33872583e5006ba75c-sb19-196-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d32a4ad65f1e2a33872583e5006ba75c-sb19-196-5-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d32a4ad65f1e2a33872583e5006ba75c-sb19-196-3-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback