CO SB197 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning measures for the conservation of water in the state, and, in connection therewith, implementing the proposals of the Colorado river drought task force.
Title
Water Conservation Measures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 24-197 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.006) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 24-197, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 24-197, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.006) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 24-197, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 24-197, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-22 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/17/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |