CO SB210 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Fix Colorado Roads Act
Title
Fix Colorado Roads Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.026 (Attachment A) to Senate Bill 16-210 (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-210 to the Committee on Finance The motion failed on a vote of 4-5. (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 16-210 indefinitely (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-210 to the Committee on Finance The motion failed on a vote of 4-5. (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 16-210 indefinitely (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-210 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment H ) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-210, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-210 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment H ) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-210, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-210 to the Committee on Finance The motion failed on a vote of 4-5. (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 16-210 indefinitely (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-210 to the Committee on Finance The motion failed on a vote of 4-5. (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 16-210 indefinitely (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-210 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment H ) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-210, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-210 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment H ) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-210, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2016-05-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |