CO SB212 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Storm Water Facilities Not Injure Water Rights
Title
Storm Water Facilities Not Injure Water Rights
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 The motion failed on a vote of 3-8. (Y: 3 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-212, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-212, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-212, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 The motion failed on a vote of 3-8. (Y: 3 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-212, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-212, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-212, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2015-05-05 | Senate | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2015-05-04 | Senate | First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2015-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-30 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-04-29 | House | House Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |