CO SB213 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Construction Defect Litigation Study Group
Title
Construction Defect Litigation Study Group
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 16-213 indefinitely (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-213 to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 1 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 16-213 indefinitely (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-213 to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 1 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-213, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-213 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-213, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-213 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-213 to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 1 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 16-213 indefinitely (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-213 to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 1 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-213, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-213 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-213, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-213 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2016-05-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs + Judiciary |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |