CO SB213 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the authority of businesses licensed to sell alcohol beverages for consumption on the licensed premises to sell alcohol beverages for consumption off the licensed premises.
Title
Alcohol Beverage Retail Takeout And Delivery
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-213, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-06-11 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-213, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-213, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-213, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-213, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-06-11 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-213, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-213, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-213, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-10 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2020-06-13 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-12 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-06-11 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-06-11 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-06-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |