CO SB218 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the medical marijuana program, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations contained in the 2018 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies and making an appropriation.
Title
Sunset Medical Marijuana Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-218 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-218, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-218, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-218, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment LL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment OO) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-218, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-218, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-218 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-218, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-218, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-218, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment LL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment OO) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-218, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-218, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-04-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-27 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-26 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-24 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-04-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |